Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John Joyce, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feinstein, Brian Ross, Wright, John David, against Gary Banta, represented by Wells, Kimberly Marie, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 11, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 13, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 13, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 17, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 20, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 17, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 17, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 19, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
October 11, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 26, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
December 20, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 17, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 13, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 13, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.