Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
John Michael Salvador Extr, John Salvador Jr Estate Of, Madeline Sheila Galvin Rxtr, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rubin, Daniel Sidney Lawrence, against Stone Cast Inc, Terrance Karanikas, Terry Karanikas A K A Terrance Karanikas, represented by Cunningham, Eugene John, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 18, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: July 30, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 30, 2021 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
July 28, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
May 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 18, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
May 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of First Promissory Note |
||
May 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Second Promissory Note |
||
May 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Copy of Third Promissory Note |
||
May 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Copy of the Fourth Promissory Note |
||
May 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Letters Testamentary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.