Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Peter Plue, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
August 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
May 27, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.