Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Christopher Allen, Christopher M Allen, Christopher R Allen, Garrick Ditlefsen, Jennifer Allen, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Hon. Felix J Catena presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHon. Felix J Catena Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - Ti  (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 18, 2022COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 25, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 25, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 25, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021TERMS OF SALE
Date: October 25, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 14, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: March 25, 2022OATH
Date: March 02, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - iii  (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - Tii  (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 22, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 16, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #3) *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 25, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 25, 2022 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
October 25, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
August 23, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 23, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 21, 2022 | Proof of Service - Notice of Sale | ||
July 21, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SALE 104362 AJS |
||
May 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SALE 104362 AJS |
||
May 18, 2022 | Proof of Service - Notice of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.