Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Krogmann, Hon. David B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKrogmann, Hon. David B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time682 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
June 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #004) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
June 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre-Motion Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
May 15, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #004) Decided: 06/02/2017Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
May 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #004) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
May 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre-Note Post Judgment Application Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
May 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #004) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
November 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
November 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
August 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #003) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.