Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAuffredou, Hon. Martin D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time861 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
March 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
February 22, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 06/13/2017Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
February 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
December 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
August 30, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/28/2016Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
August 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
June 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Default Auffredou (Settlement Conference) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.