Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
62 Ricks Road Llc, Linda Dubilier, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Miller, Marc William, against Deborah Dougan, Glo Woodstock Llc, Peter Dougan, represented by Ragues, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Julian Schreibman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulian Schreibman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COURT NOTICE
Date: July 17, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: July 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 30, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: January 27, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: March 21, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 29, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
July 17, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 11, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Conference |
||
July 06, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT ADR Opt In letter. |
||
June 30, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
April 21, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
April 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands |
||
April 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Defendants' Combined Demands for Discovery |
||
April 21, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Defendants' Notice of Plaintiff's Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.