Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Terra Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Barry, Kevin Patrick, against American Express Centurion Bank, Clerk Newman, Discover Bank, Midland Funding Llc, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Julian Schreibman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulian Schreibman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15 Rpapl) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 24, 2021JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 | DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT | ||
February 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
May 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 07, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001)
Judge: Schreibman, Hon. Julian D. |
|
February 24, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) AOS Portfolio Recovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.