Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Capital One Bank, Emma Greenwood, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mackey, Joshua E, Mazzarella, Christina A, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Dale Brenner, Ez Hvac And Plumbing, Shantel T Woolcock, represented by Weiner, Cappy, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with James P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT *Corrected*
Date: March 21, 2024JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: July 25, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: July 25, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL - COURT OF APPEALS *Corrected*
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: February 13, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: February 03, 2023DECISION AFTER TRIAL
Date: January 27, 2023FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED)
Date: January 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: December 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 16, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 31, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: July 14, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: July 14, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: April 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 09, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 08, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 25, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 16, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*
Date: April 07, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 30, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2024 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT *Corrected* | ||
July 26, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 25, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
July 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | ||
February 15, 2023 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
February 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL - COURT OF APPEALS *Corrected* | ||
February 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Notice of Appeal |
||
February 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected* with Affidavit of Service |
||
January 27, 2023 | DECISION AFTER TRIAL | ||
January 05, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.