Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Janette M. Cortes, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Millouras-Lettre, Rebecca Ann, against Javier M. Cortes, represented by Casella, Amanda Nicole, Cometti, Mario David, Coughtry, Joann Elizabeth, De Moya, Desiree Venicia, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
October 31, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 27, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 26, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 22, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
October 11, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 27, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 14, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 14, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 05, 2022 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.