Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael Eden, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Melley, Steven Michael, against Andy Antonio Estrada-Perez And, Saloman M. Popchub, represented by Gray, Lela Marlene, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) SOD |
||
February 25, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS BP |
||
January 13, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demands |
||
January 13, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Stmt of Auth for E-Filing |
||
January 03, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
December 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS (Perez) |
||
August 26, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.