Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christina Knisley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ragues, Raymond, against Alan Lloyd Knisley, represented by Stiglmeier, Eileen Marie, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
August 12, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 02, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
June 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 10, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
June 03, 2021 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.