Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Manfredi, Linda P., Tremaroli, Robert Steven, against Jeanmarie Lynch, John Doe 1-10, Secretary Of Housing & Urban Dev, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher Cahill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher Cahill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: April 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: December 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
December 16, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected* Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
December 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Conversion with AOS |
||
July 01, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE TO MORTGAGOR |
||
January 13, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
||
January 13, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION |
||
April 18, 2019 | APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING | ||
April 18, 2019 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.