Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bhatia, Raspreet, against Jane Does, John Does, Secretary Of Housing & Urban Dev Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Us O B O, Valari L Way By Ex Valari B Way A K A By Ex, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with James P Gilpatric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Gilpatric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: April 17, 2018STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 22, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
June 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 30, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE-NOTICE TO MORTGAGOR and MORTGAGORS DECLARATION OF COVID-19 RELATED HARDSHIP |
||
January 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service and EF-28a Notice |
||
January 11, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
January 11, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION |
||
April 17, 2018 | APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.