Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Benedictine Hospital, David Guido, Discover Bank, State Tax Commission, Vincent R Guido Sr By Adm, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin Bryant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin Bryant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: August 29, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 06, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) Signed |
||
September 13, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | ||
September 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE (Motion #003) | ||
September 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) | ||
September 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) | ||
March 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 01, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF OPT-OUT |
||
September 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE W/EXHIBIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.