Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Fisher, Hon. Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFisher, Hon. Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2018 |
Time To Trial466 days |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time468 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Post-Jury Verdict Mott (Court Activity) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Trial Ended Mott (Trial Part) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Jury Drawn Mott (Trial Part) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Trial Commenced Mott (Trial Part) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Mott (Trial Part) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 12, 2018 | Hearing |
Transferred from IAS Justice Fisher (Court Activity) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Lisa |
|
September 10, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
August 14, 2018 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Fisher (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Lisa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.