Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Mott, Hon. Richard L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMott, Hon. Richard L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management76 days |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2013 |
CategoryTort-Medical, Dental, Or Podiatric Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time652 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Discontinued Mott (Court Activity) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
May 11, 2015 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Mott (Trial Part) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
April 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
April 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Mott (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
April 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Discontinued Mott (Court Activity) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
April 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
January 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Transferred to Tap Mott (Court Activity) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
January 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
December 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Mott (Court Activity) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
|
October 20, 2014 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mott (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Mott, Hon. Richard L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.