Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Om-Other case in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCahill, Hon. Christopher E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 10, 2013 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2013 | Hearing |
Settled Cahill (Court Activity) Judge: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. |
|
June 14, 2013 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Cahill (Motion Part) Judge: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. |
|
June 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Cahill (Motion Part) Judge: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. |
|
May 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Cahill (Motion Part) Judge: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. |
|
April 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Cahill (Motion Part) Judge: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. |
|
April 10, 2013 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 06/14/2013Decided Before Justice: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cahill, Hon. Christopher E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.