Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Cristie Rosenberg, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 24, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 24, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
February 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
September 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.