Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Johnson, Heather Ann, against Cierra R Cain, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service and Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 21, 2021DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: December 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts by Debtor Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-military Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 21, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 22, 2021 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST denied-additional notice not received |
||
December 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 21, 2021 | Affirmation of Additional Mailing | ||
December 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service and Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR Proof of Service and Invoice Redacted |
||
December 21, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redaction Cover Page |
||
December 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Original Creditor Redacted |
||
December 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts by Debtor Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Facts by Debtor Plaintiff Redacted |
||
December 21, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of SOL | ||
December 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-military Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affirmation of Non-military Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.