Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Steven Mohlke As Executor Of The Estate Of Charles Mohler, Deceased, And On Behalf Of Decedent'S Distributees, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rappaport, Charles J, against Natalie G. Robertson, represented by Hanson, Paul Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 28, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 08, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 28, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
December 08, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Case Resolution Ltr to Court |
||
October 28, 2021 |
ANSWER Notice of Appearance and Answer |
||
October 28, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for VBOP |
||
October 28, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands |
||
September 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.