Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
First National Bank Of Groton, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nash, Ralph Walton, against Larry L. Eaton, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 18, 2021EXECUTION
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
November 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 10, 2021 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
November 05, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Default Judgment |
||
November 05, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Status Report |
||
November 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
November 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Promissory Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.