Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Melissa Lewin, Robert Lewin, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case against Board Of Assessment Review, Tompkins County Department Of Assessment, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 29, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 17, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 24, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
August 12, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
July 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
July 30, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
July 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
July 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A 2021 Tax Grievance |
||
July 29, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.