Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brooklane 10 De Llc, Brooklane 16 De Llc, Candlewyck Park 10 De, Llc, Candlewyck Park 16 De, Gaslight Village 10 De, Llc, (total of 12) See All filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Browne, Erika C, against Tompkins County Board Of Assessment Review, Tompkins County Department Of Assessment, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 19, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Stipulation and Order of Settlement |
||
November 03, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 19, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 17, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 18, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Proof of Service on Director of Assessment |
||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Proof of Service upon County Finance, School & City, Town and Village Clerks |
||
July 19, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 19, 2021 |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Application for Review of Assessment |
||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints on Real Property Assessment for 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.