Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Daniel Martin Motels, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Feldman, Christopher H, against Board Of Assessors And The Board Of Assessment Review Of Tompkins County, New York, Tompkins County, New York, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
November 09, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Reason for Recusal |
||
April 19, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 17, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 05, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail of Notice of Petition etc to School Superintendent |
||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail of Notice of Petition etc to County Treasurer's Office |
||
July 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 2021 Notice of Petition etc on Assessor in re 1 Sheraton Drive |
||
July 16, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.