Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paul H Teeter, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Damm, Kelly Ann, against Rose M Cochran-Teeter, represented by Hanrahan, John H., in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
April 05, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) | ||
April 05, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 05, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 29, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
March 29, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 29, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
March 29, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 14, 2022 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
October 13, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.