Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Southern Tier Hospitality, Llc, Twin Tier Hospitality, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Jacobson, Robert L, against Tompkins County Board Of Assessment Review, Tompkins County Department Of Assessment, Tompkins County, New York, Town Of Ithaca, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 15, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: July 15, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 29, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 15, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 03, 2022ASSIGNED RJI
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Stipulation and Consent Order |
||
April 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Proposed Settlement Order |
||
April 19, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail |
||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
July 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 15, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
July 15, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Tax Certiorari Review |
||
July 15, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.