Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ithaca Airport Hospitality, Llc, Twin Tier Hospitality, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Jacobson, Robert L, against City Of Ithaca, Tompkins County Board Of Assessment Review, Tompkins County Department Of Assessment, Tompkins County, New York, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 15, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: April 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Stipulation and Consent Order |
||
April 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Proposed Settlement Order |
||
April 18, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail |
||
July 27, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 15, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 15, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Tax Certiorari Review |
||
July 15, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
July 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.