Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Catherine Stramba, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lama, Luciano L., against Michael Ayers, represented by Savage, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 22, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 22, 2021DEMAND FOR: *Corrected*
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 22, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 11, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 30, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: April 01, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) SDA |
||
May 11, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr to Judge re Discovery Dispute |
||
April 01, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
March 30, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 22, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
February 22, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: NOTICE OF REVOCATION |
||
February 22, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A BILL OF PARTICULARS |
||
February 22, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: NOTICE FOR IME |
||
February 22, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: *Corrected* DEMAND FOR MEDICARE/MEDICAID |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.