Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Brenda Graves, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 25, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST DENIED-THE STIPULATION DEFAULT LETTER IS NOT ADDRESSED TO DEFENDANT |
||
May 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT |
||
May 26, 2022 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST denied-default letter is not to defendant and need explanation of amounts |
||
May 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
May 18, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
May 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
May 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
May 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 LETTER TO DEFENDANT |
||
March 07, 2022 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST judgment needs to be filed with a $45.00 fee |
||
January 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Letter to Defendant(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.