Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Five Star Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mcandrew, John Kevin, against Debra L. Pealo, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph R. Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph R. Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST Denied |
||
July 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice for $400 and two NSF charges of $20.00 each |
||
July 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of investigator and military pull |
||
June 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of additional mailing |
||
June 30, 2021 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE | ||
June 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A to Fee Affirmation |
||
June 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
June 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B to Fee Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.