Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Daniel T. Topoleski, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Maines, Russell Edgar, against Martins Ochu, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2020MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: October 07, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: October 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Itemized Statement of Attorneys' Fees / Costs |
||
November 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1) Affirmation RE: Calculations and Fees |
||
November 29, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order and Judgment |
||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
||
October 07, 2021 | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
October 07, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
October 06, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 06, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Ochu Tenant Rental Ledger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.