Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Phillips, Elliot, Scully, James Paul, against Robert Graham, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 18, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
March 18, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 18, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
February 18, 2021 | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
February 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #1) chain of title |
||
February 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
February 15, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.