Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Jonathan J Freund, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2020SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 18, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
February 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 07, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Facts of Purchase |
||
January 07, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT FACTS OF SALE |
||
January 07, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statues of Limitations |
||
January 07, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT 2nd Mailing |
||
January 07, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Military |
||
January 07, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 02, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 01, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.