Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vista Realty Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Kossar, Ronald Steven, against Tompkins County Department Of Assessment, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, Stumbar, L Richard, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with GERALD A. KEENE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGERALD A. KEENE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 28, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 20, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2021NOTICE
Date: August 12, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: July 31, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 11, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 31, 2020ASSIGNED RJI
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Affidavits of Mailing of Notice of Entry | ||
August 11, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Consent Order | ||
June 23, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Consent Order settling and discontinuing tax cert proceedings (Chambers will file originals in all n Consent Order settling and discontinuing tax cert proceedings (Chambers will file originals in all n ... show more |
||
June 20, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 20, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 19, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 03, 2021 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) KEENE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.