Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kathleen Davis, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Czarples, Anna Christina, against A K A Byrne Dairy & Deli, Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Sonbyrne Sales, Inc., represented by Mullins, Robert J, Schwedes, Sheila Maureen, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall On Property) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 11, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 08, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference scheduled on July 12, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. via Microsoft Teams |
||
March 03, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Masler - status update |
||
May 18, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Against Cintas only |
||
April 29, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected* Proposed Scheduling Order |
||
April 29, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge McBride |
||
April 29, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
March 17, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
March 12, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order |
||
March 12, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.