Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Raymond P Justofin, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 08, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 08, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 08, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 07, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 26, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT R&R FILE# 1337546 | ||
February 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION BILLING STATEMENT R&R FILE # 1337546 |
||
January 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1337546 | ||
January 08, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1337546 |
||
January 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1337546 |
||
January 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1337546 |
||
August 26, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 26, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 08, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.