Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flavia Tomasello, John Tsialas, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Bianchi, David W., Jones, E. Stewart, against Andrew Scherr, Benjamin Schwartz, Cornell University, Daniel Satcher, Felipe Hanuch, (total of 14) See All represented by Bryan, Catherine Graham, Burch, David George, Callahan, Janet D., Cuomo, Matthew A, Deoreo, Matthew Gerard, (total of 17) See All in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with Gerald A Keene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald A Keene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Wrongful Death) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: May 29, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) Plaintiffs' motion to enforce Sacher settlement is returnable September 4, 2020 ON SUBMISSIONS ONLY. |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #10) *Corrected* P-Affirmation in Support of Motion to Enforce (Daniel Sacher) |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #10) P-Notice of Motion to Enforce Settlement (Daniel Sacher) |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Stipulation of Discontinuance with regard to defendant Schwartz |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3) Letter from M. Cuomo withdrawing Schwartz motion to dismiss |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance as to Jack Stettner |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance |
|
July 11, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Demand for BOP and Discovery Demands |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Verified Answer to Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.