Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Citifinancial Company Fka Citifinacial Company, Daniel Dean , As Proposed Executor And As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of John P. Praast A K A John Praast, Heirs And Distributees Of The Estate Of John P. Praast A K A John Praast, Jennifer Longo , As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of John P. Praast A K A John Praast, John Doe 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property, Described In The Com, (total of 8) See All represented by Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
Daniel Dean , As Proposed Executor And As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of John P. Praast A K A John Praast
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 02, 2020 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) NOM TO DISCONTINUE THE ACTION AND TO CANCEL THE NOP |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION, CANCELLATION OF NOP |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) ORDER DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELLING NOP |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of service |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.