Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company A S O L & J.G. Stickley, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cogbill, Alexander Walker, Hoffman, Jennifer A., against Pmi Newco, Llc, The Shops At Ithaca Mall, represented by Alweis, Kenneth M., Smith, Robert J, Wang, Jennifer L., O'Neil, Matthew Warren, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 17, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: December 16, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Exhibit A - Decision & Order with Notice of Entry |
||
August 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #7) Notice of Appeal |
||
August 19, 2022 |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT (Motion #7) Informational Statement |
||
July 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 22, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
April 28, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
April 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Decision and Order |
||
April 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #7) Affirmation in Opposition to Reargument |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.