Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-R12, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Leopold, Saul O, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, Sandra C. Rupert, Sandra G. Rupert Aka, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time177 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2017CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: May 31, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SANDRA G. RUPERT |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SANDRA G RUPERT |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.