Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jaime Baraby Individually, And As Co-Administrator Of The Estate Of Kaila Baraby, Kenneth Baraby Individually, And As Co-Administrator Of The Estate Of Kaila Baraby, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Galgano Iii, Louis J, Peloza, Scott Timothy, Wallitt, Sara Teresa, against Christine M. Dec, Ian M. Mccray, represented by Miller, Keith Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time872 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Defendant's Request to Charge |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED Judicial Subpoena |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Request for Signature on Officer Subpoenas |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS subpoenas for NYS Police |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #2b) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.