Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Sara Armstrong, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 14, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time230 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 14, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: October 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) *Corrected* | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADMINSTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SARA ARMSTRONG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.