Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee For Lsf9 Master Participation Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cascino, Margaret Jaffe, Lawrence, Peter Adel, Scali, Anthony Paul, Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, against Bank Of America, N.A., Jeanne J. Henderson, John Doe, Tompkins County Clerk, represented by Rogers, Heather C, Wohl, Betsy, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with John C Rowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C Rowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1000 days |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1000 days |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: February 10, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 24, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) ATTORNEY FEE AFIRMATION |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) SCHEDULED A PROPOERTY DESCRIPTION |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #2) OATH AND REPORT |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #2) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) ANSWER AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.