Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Donald W Berich, Donna M Berich, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kopko, Edward E, Violette, Jason, against Cayuga Health System, Inc, Cayuga Medical Center At Ithaca, Inc, Justin Fedor D O, represented by Coghlan, John Patrick, Felter, Karen Guyder, Johnson, Eric Gates, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 23, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 08, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: January 30, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2016COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 23, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 05, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 05, 2021MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: April 06, 2021DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) relevant medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 02, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 05, 2021ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: July 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 10, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 09, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 01, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: February 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2022ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: December 01, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 23, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 23, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: February 01, 2023MARKED PLEADINGS
Date: February 01, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: February 01, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 01, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: February 01, 2023MARKED PLEADINGS
Date: February 01, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 01, 2023MARKED PLEADINGS
Date: February 01, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 02, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 06, 2022PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: February 13, 2023TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES
Date: February 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 13, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: February 24, 2023ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: February 23, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 02, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 14, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: April 06, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2023 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
March 27, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 21, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 14, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 02, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 24, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 24, 2023 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
February 23, 2023 | ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE | ||
February 21, 2023 | TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES | ||
February 14, 2023 |
NOTICE Recusal by Hon. Elizabeth Aherne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.