Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citifinancial Company D B A Citifinancial Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mannino, Rosario, Weber-Cantrell, Jaclyn Ann, against Beckey J Tripp, Becky Tripp, Cacv Of Colorado Llc, Calvary Portfolio Services Llc Ao Calvary Spv I Llc Aao Providian National Bank, Cayuga Medical Center, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with John C Rowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C Rowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 06, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Sale | ||
April 02, 2023 | REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE | ||
April 02, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
February 06, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
February 06, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Sale | ||
October 04, 2022 | Notice of Entry - Order | ||
September 28, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order Extending Time to Set Sale and Appointing Substitute Referee |
||
May 26, 2022 | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
May 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
May 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Conference Status Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.