Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Debra Pealo, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kopko, Edward E, against Cayuga Medical Center At Ithaca Inc, David A Schwed, David A Schwed Md, Surgical Associates Of Ithaca Pc, represented by Saitta, Thomas A., in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2012 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 14, 2012ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: March 01, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 13, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Adjournment of trial scheduled on November 14, 2022 |
||
September 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 14, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial scheduled on November 14, 2022 at 8:45 a.m. |
||
February 02, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference scheduled on March 14, 2022 at 10:30 am. via MT |
||
March 01, 2021 |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Amended Trial Order |
||
March 01, 2021 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
June 14, 2012 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
June 14, 2012 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INDEX # APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.