Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2016 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time308 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT RUMSEY (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY |
|
June 06, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) RUMSEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY |
|
June 03, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) RUMSEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY |
|
April 22, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) RUMSEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY |
|
April 22, 2016 | Motion |
CONFIRM REFEREE'S REPORT & JUD (Motion #001) Decided: 06/06/2016GRANTED,JUDGMENT SIGNED 6/6/16 Before Justice: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY |
|
August 03, 2015 | Hearing |
DEFAULT RUMSEY (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.