Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
April 09, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
April 09, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE-WITHDRAWN FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
April 07, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT APPLICATION FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
March 12, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
March 12, 2021 | Motion |
CONTEMPT OF COURT @ 9:30AM (Motion #002) Decided: 04/09/2021WITHDRAWN. Before Justice: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
April 10, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
April 10, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
March 01, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
January 11, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.