Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
October 15, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #004) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 01, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #004) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
February 26, 2020 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #004) Decided: 10/15/2020ADJ. FR 4/7/20-VIA SKYPE @ 2:3 Before Justice: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
February 26, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #004) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
August 01, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
July 25, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #003) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
July 10, 2019 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #003) Decided: 08/01/2019WITHDRAWN. Before Justice: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
May 23, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.